Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Antonio Cardinal Pucci

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Quattro Coronati


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Oct 1484BornFlorence
5 Nov 151834.1AppointedBishop of Pistoia, Italy
8 Jun 152944.7AppointedBishop of Vannes, France
22 Sep 153147.0Elevated to Cardinal
27 Sep 153147.0InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi Quattro Coronati
10 Jun 154156.7ResignedBishop of Vannes, France
8 Nov 154157.1ResignedBishop of Pistoia, Italy
14 Nov 154157.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere
15 Feb 154257.4AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
8 Jan 154358.3AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
12 Oct 154460.0DiedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina

MicroData Summary for Antonio Pucci:
Cardinal Antonio Pucci (born , died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina

  • a cardinal for 13.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 22 Sep 1531
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 275

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 18 Dec 2013