Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan Wilamowski

Deceased

Bishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Kamieniec)


Events

DateEventTitle
17 Oct 1539AppointedBishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Kamieniec), Ukraine
7 Mar 1540Ordained BishopBishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Kamieniec), Ukraine
1541¹DiedBishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Kamieniec), Ukraine

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jan Wilamowski
Bishop Jan Wilamowski (died 1541) Bishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Kamieniec)

  • a bishop for .8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 148
  • ob/c2+: CB, 15 Dec 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 16 Dec 2016