Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Vallo della Lucania

Dioecesis Vallensis in Lucania



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Ciro Miniero, Bishop
  • Giuseppe Rocco Favale, Bishop Emeritus

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Capaccio
12th CenturyErectedDiocese of Capaccio (erected)
Diocese of Capaccio e Vallo della Lucania
16 July 1851Name ChangedDiocese of Capaccio Diocese of Capaccio e Vallo della Lucania
Diocese of Vallo di Lucania
24 November 1945Name ChangedDiocese of Capaccio e Vallo della Lucania Diocese of Vallo di Lucania
Diocese of Vallo della Lucania
30 September 1986Name ChangedDiocese of Vallo di Lucania Diocese of Vallo della Lucania

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Vallo di Lucania
1950151,000151,000100.0%90281181,27933133107ap1951
1969160,260160,302100.0%98251231,3023016995ap1971
1980153,100154,77298.9%105211261,21523167135ap1981
Diocese of Vallo della Lucania
1990161,000162,00099.4%80291091,477231155136ap1991
1999159,112161,31298.6%81251061,501925111136ap2000
2000156,520158,85298.5%82241061,476924113136ap2001
2001156,520158,85298.5%82221041,50592292136ap2002
2002156,520158,86698.5%81201011,549920109136ap2003
2003156,534158,86698.5%8019991,581919101136ap2004
2004156,520158,86698.5%83201031,519920112137ap2005
2010157,000161,00097.5%87191061,48191987138ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 17 Mar 2014