Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Francesco Giocoli

Deceased

Bishop of Capaccio, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Nov 1664Born
3 Apr 168823.4Ordained DeaconDeacon
12 Jun 168823.6Ordained PriestPriest
16 Jul 170338.7AppointedBishop of San Severo, Italy
22 Jul 170338.7Ordained BishopBishop of San Severo, Italy
15 Mar 171752.3AppointedBishop of Capaccio, Italy
14 Dec 172359.1DiedBishop of Capaccio, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Francesco Giocoli
Bishop Carlo Francesco Giocoli (born , died ) Bishop of Capaccio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceS. Archangeli

  • a priest for 35.5 years
  • a bishop for 20.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 142, and Page 355
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1703, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018