Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Sperello Cardinal Sperelli

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Terni, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of San Giovanni a Porta Latina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Aug 1639Born
7 Feb 166323.4Ordained PriestPriest
10 Jan 168444.4AppointedBishop of Terni, Italy
Jan 1693³53.3AppointedVicegerent of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Jun 1698³58.7ResignedVicegerent of Roma {Rome}, Italy
14 Dec 169859.3ResignedBishop of Terni, Italy
14 Nov 169960.2Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
24 Nov 169960.2Elevated to Cardinal
3 Feb 170060.4InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Giovanni a Porta Latina
22 Mar 171070.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Terni, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Sperello Sperelli
Sperello Cardinal Sperelli (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Terni

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAssisi

  • a priest for 47.1 years
  • a cardinal for 10.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 14 Nov 1699
  • b: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1684, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Feb 2017