Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Lorenzo Tilli

Deceased

Bishop of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Mar 1652³Born
19 Jul 167624.3Ordained PriestPriest
21 Jul 170452.3AppointedBishop of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro), Italy
10 Aug 170452.3Ordained BishopBishop of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro), Italy
4 Jan 172471.7DiedBishop of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro), Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Lorenzo Tilli
Bishop Giovanni Lorenzo Tilli (born , died ) Bishop of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastelfiorentino, Archdiocese of Firenze {Florence}
Ordained BishopSant Ignazio, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceBorgo San Sepolcro, Diocese of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro)
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Borgo San Sepolcro, Diocese of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro)

  • a priest for 47.4 years
  • a bishop for 19.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 131
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1704, Number 21
  • b/c2+: AT, 30 Sep 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018