Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanbattista Carafa

Deceased

Bishop of Nocera de’ Pagani, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jun 1652³Born
23 Feb 168734.6Ordained PriestPriest
21 Jun 170047.9AppointedBishop of Nocera de’ Pagani, Italy
27 Jun 170048.0Ordained BishopBishop of Nocera de’ Pagani, Italy
22 Feb 171562.6DiedBishop of Nocera de’ Pagani, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanbattista Carafa
Bishop Giovanbattista Carafa (born , died ) Bishop of Nocera de’ Pagani

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli

  • a priest for 27.9 years
  • a bishop for 14.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 294
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1700, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018