Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Paolo Gerardi

Deceased

Bishop of Anagni


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Mar 1633BornRoma
15 Apr 169663.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
23 Apr 169663.1Ordained PriestPriest
21 May 169663.2AppointedBishop of Anagni, Italy
3 Jun 169663.2Ordained BishopBishop of Anagni, Italy
31 May 170875.2DiedBishop of Anagni, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Paolo Gerardi:
Bishop Pietro Paolo Gerardi (born , died ) Bishop of Anagni

  • a priest for 12.1 years
  • a bishop for 11.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 83
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1696, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 5 May 2015