Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Andrea Monreale

Deceased

Archbishop of Reggio Calabria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Oct 1653BornBrindisi
8 Apr 168531.5Ordained DeaconDeacon
15 Apr 168531.5Ordained PriestPriest
4 Jul 169541.7AppointedArchbishop of Lanciano, Italy
10 Jul 169541.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Lanciano, Italy
21 May 169642.6AppointedArchbishop of Reggio Calabria, Italy
Jul 1726³72.7DiedArchbishop of Reggio Calabria, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Andrea Monreale:
Archbishop Giovanni Andrea Monreale (born , died Jul 1726) Archbishop of Reggio Calabria

  • a priest for 41.2 years
  • a bishop for 30.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 235, and Page 332
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1695, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 5 May 2015