Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marco Antonio de Rosa

Deceased

Bishop of Policastro, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jul 1669Born
24 Feb 169424.5Ordained PriestPriest
14 Dec 170536.3AppointedBishop of Policastro, Italy
20 Dec 170536.4Ordained BishopBishop of Policastro, Italy
28 Nov 170940.3DiedBishop of Policastro, Italy

MicroData Summary for Marco Antonio de Rosa
Bishop Marco Antonio de Rosa (born , died ) Bishop of Policastro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCava de' Tirreni
Ordained BishopSan Carlo, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 15.7 years
  • a bishop for 3.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 319
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1705, Number 21
  • b/c23: AT, 7 Mar 2017
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 231, Number 19,299

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Apr 2017