Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bartolomeo Gambadoro

Deceased

Bishop of Ruvo (Ruo)(di Puglia), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Aug 1669Born
7 Apr 169626.6Ordained DeaconDeacon
1 Jun 169727.7Ordained PriestPriest
14 Dec 170536.3AppointedBishop of Ruvo (Ruo)(di Puglia), Italy
20 Dec 170536.3Ordained BishopBishop of Ruvo (Ruo)(di Puglia), Italy
Aug 1730³60.9DiedBishop of Ruvo (Ruo)(di Puglia), Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bartolomeo Gambadoro
Bishop Bartolomeo Gambadoro (born , died Aug 1730) Bishop of Ruvo (Ruo)(di Puglia)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMonte Gargano
Ordained BishopSan Carlo, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 33.1 years
  • a bishop for 24.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1726
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 337
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1705, Number 22
  • ob/c23: AT, 7 Mar 2017
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 231, Number 19,300

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Apr 2017