Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raffaele Maria Filamondo, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Sessa Aurunca, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jun 1649³Born
14 Dec 170556.4AppointedBishop of Sessa Aurunca, Italy
20 Dec 170556.5Ordained BishopBishop of Sessa Aurunca, Italy
15 Aug 170657.1DiedBishop of Sessa Aurunca, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Raffaele Maria Filamondo (VIAF: 5309845)
Bishop Raffaele Maria Filamondo O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Sessa Aurunca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}
Ordained BishopSan Carlo, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for .6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 365
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1705, Number 23
  • ob/c23: AT, 7 Mar 2017
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 231, Number 19,301

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Apr 2017