Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Oronzio Filomarini, C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Gallipoli, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Apr 1662Born
28 May 170038.1AppointedBishop of Gallipoli, Italy
31 May 170038.1Ordained BishopBishop of Gallipoli, Italy
5 Mar 174178.8ResignedBishop of Gallipoli, Italy
1744¹81.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Gallipoli, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Oronzio Filomarini
Bishop Oronzio Filomarini C.R. (born , died 1744) Bishop Emeritus of Gallipoli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}

  • a bishop for 43.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 208
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,700, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast