Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Niccol˛ Cardinal Radulovich

Deceased

Archbishop of Chieti

Cardinal-Priest of San Bartolomeo all’Isola


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1627²BornPolignano
16 Feb 165932.1Ordained PriestPriest
10 Mar 165932.1AppointedArchbishop of Chieti, Italy
16 Mar 165932.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Chieti, Italy
14 Nov 169972.8Elevated to Cardinal
3 Feb 170073.0InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Bartolomeo all’Isola
27 Oct 170275.8DiedArchbishop of Chieti, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Niccol˛ Radulovich:
Niccol˛ Cardinal Radulovich (born 1627, died ) Archbishop of Chieti

  • a priest for 43.6 years
  • a bishop for 43.6 years
  • a cardinal for 2.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 14 Nov 1699
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 332
  • ob/c2: CB, 10 Aug 2014
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1659, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 18 Apr 2015