Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Diez de Aux

Deceased

Bishop of Gerace


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Mar 1646BornAversa
12 May 166923.1Ordained PriestPriest
7 Nov 168943.6AppointedBishop of Gerace, Italy
13 Nov 168943.6Ordained BishopBishop of Gerace, Italy
5 Nov 172983.6DiedBishop of Gerace, Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico Diez de Aux:
Bishop Domenico Diez de Aux (born , died ) Bishop of Gerace

  • a priest for 60.4 years
  • a bishop for 39.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Number 16,108
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1689, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 2 May 2015