Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giaconto Tuartkovich, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Stagno (Ston)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Oct 1641BornRagusa
29 Mar 166422.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Friars Minor
19 Dec 166524.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
11 Nov 169251.1SelectedBishop of Stagno (Ston), Croatia
13 Apr 169351.5ConfirmedBishop of Stagno (Ston), Croatia
18 Apr 169351.5Ordained BishopBishop of Stagno (Ston), Croatia
Jan 1694³52.2DiedBishop of Stagno (Ston), Croatia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giaconto Tuartkovich:
Bishop Giaconto Tuartkovich O.F.M. (born , died Jan 1694) Bishop of Stagno (Ston)

  • a priest for 28.0 years
  • a bishop for .7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 363
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1693, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 28 Apr 2015