Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giacinto Camillo Maradei

Deceased

Bishop of Policastro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Mar 1636³BornLaino Castello
25 Feb 166831.9Ordained PriestPriest
2 Apr 169660.0AppointedBishop of Policastro, Italy
8 Apr 169660.1Ordained BishopBishop of Policastro, Italy
2 Sep 170569.5DiedBishop of Policastro, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giacinto Camillo Maradei:
Bishop Giacinto Camillo Maradei (born , died ) Bishop of Policastro

  • a priest for 37.5 years
  • a bishop for 9.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 319
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1696, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 5 May 2015