Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Carlo Loffredo, C.R. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Capua


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Mar 1635BornCardito
6 Oct 167035.5AppointedBishop of Molfetta, Italy
19 Oct 167035.5Ordained BishopBishop of Molfetta, Italy
26 Nov 169156.6AppointedArchbishop of Bari (-Canosa), Italy
10 Mar 169862.9AppointedArchbishop of Capua, Italy
Jan 1701³65.7DiedArchbishop of Capua, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Carlo Loffredo:
Archbishop Carlo Loffredo C.R. (born , died Jan 1701) Archbishop of Capua

  • a bishop for 30.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 114, and Page 142
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 265
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1670, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 2 May 2015