Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Rottario (Rovero)

Deceased

Bishop of Alba (Pompea), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Sep 1657Born
23 Mar 168123.4Ordained DeaconDeacon
25 Mar 168123.5Ordained PriestPriest
27 Mar 169739.5AppointedBishop of Alba (Pompea), Italy
8 Apr 169739.5Ordained BishopBishop of Alba (Pompea), Italy
4 Nov 172063.1DiedBishop of Alba (Pompea), Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Rottario (Rovero)
Bishop Giuseppe Rottario (Rovero) (born , died ) Bishop of Alba (Pompea)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVicia

  • a priest for 39.6 years
  • a bishop for 23.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 75
  • ob/c2+: CB, 12 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,697, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast