Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gianfrancesco Riccamonti, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Cervia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1627¹BornRoma
21 Sep 165225.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
4 Apr 166841.2AppointedBishop of Cervia, Italy
15 Apr 166841.2Ordained BishopBishop of Cervia, Italy
17 Apr 170780.2DiedBishop of Cervia, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gianfrancesco Riccamonti:
Bishop Gianfrancesco Riccamonti O.S.B. (born 1627, died ) Bishop of Cervia

  • a priest for 54.5 years
  • a bishop for 39.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 155
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 146
  • c34: CB, 12 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations piscopales, Year 1668, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 26 Apr 2015