Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Romualdo Tancredi, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Montalcino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jul 1637³BornSienne
24 Sep 166124.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
9 Aug 168851.0AppointedBishop of Montalcino, Italy
22 Aug 168851.1Ordained BishopBishop of Montalcino, Italy
Dec 1694²57.4DiedBishop of Montalcino, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Romualdo Tancredi:
Bishop Romualdo Tancredi O.S.B. (born , died Dec 1694) Bishop of Montalcino

  • a priest for 33.1 years
  • a bishop for 6.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 227
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1688, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 25 Apr 2015