Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giambattista Zeccadoro

Deceased

Bishop of Fossombrone, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Oct 1615Born
24 Aug 164832.8AppointedBishop of Fossombrone, Italy
16 Nov 1696³81.0DiedBishop of Fossombrone, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giambattista Zeccadoro
Bishop Giambattista Zeccadoro (born , died ) Bishop of Fossombrone

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 204
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 190
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1648, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast