Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicola Lepori, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Saluzzo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Feb 1623BornPichi
9 Apr 166845.1AppointedBishop of Saluzzo, Italy
15 Apr 166845.1Ordained BishopBishop of Saluzzo, Italy
21 Dec 168663.8DiedBishop of Saluzzo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Nicola Lepori:
Bishop Nicola Lepori O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Saluzzo

  • a bishop for 18.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 341
  • c34: CB, 12 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1668, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 7 Apr 2015