Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lelio Ardizzone

Deceased

Bishop of Casale Monferrato


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jul 1629BornCasale Monferrato
8 Sep 166132.1Ordained PriestPriest of Casale Monferrato, Italy
13 May 168050.8AppointedBishop of Casale Monferrato, Italy
19 May 168050.8Ordained BishopBishop of Casale Monferrato, Italy
Nov 1699³70.3DiedBishop of Casale Monferrato, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Lelio Ardizzone:
Bishop Lelio Ardizzone (born , died Nov 1699) Bishop of Casale Monferrato

  • a priest for 38.1 years
  • a bishop for 19.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 146
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1680, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 17 Apr 2015