Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gregorio Carducci

Deceased

Bishop of Valva e Sulmona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Mar 1617BornRoma
14 Jun 165538.2AppointedBishop of Valva e Sulmona, Italy
27 Jun 165538.2Ordained BishopBishop of Valva e Sulmona, Italy
13 Jan 1701³83.8DiedBishop of Valva e Sulmona, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gregorio Carducci:
Bishop Gregorio Carducci (born , died ) Bishop of Valva e Sulmona

  • a bishop for 45.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 118, Number 718
  • bb: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 358
  • b: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1655, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015