Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Benedetto Milazzi

Deceased

Bishop of Ostuni


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1632BornVigilien
10 Apr 167947.3AppointedBishop of Ostuni, Italy
16 Apr 167947.3Ordained BishopBishop of Ostuni, Italy
Nov 170674.8DiedBishop of Ostuni, Italy

MicroData Summary for Benedetto Milazzi:
Bishop Benedetto Milazzi Bishop of Ostuni

  • a bishop for 27.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 299

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013