Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Carlo Labia, C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Adria, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1624¹Born
27 Jan 165935.0AppointedArchbishop of Corfù, Greece
9 Feb 165935.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Corfù, Greece
13 Sep 167753.6AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Adria, Italy
29 Nov 170177.9DiedBishop of Adria, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Carlo Labia
Archbishop Carlo Labia C.R. (born 1624, died ) Bishop of Adria

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenice

  • a bishop for 42.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 121, Number 736
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 164
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1659, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018