Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Agustín Cardinal Spínola Basadone

Deceased

Archbishop of Sevilla {Seville}

Cardinal-Priest of San Bartolomeo all’Isola


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Aug 1597³BornGenova, Italy
11 Jan 162123.3Elevated to Cardinal
1622¹24.3Ordained PriestPriest
5 Mar 162325.5AppointedBishop of Tortosa, Spain
30 Apr 162325.6Ordained BishopBishop of Tortosa, Spain
18 Dec 162326.3InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santi Cosma e Damiano
7 Sep 162629.0AppointedArchbishop of Granada, Spain
23 Oct 163033.1AppointedArchbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain
24 Mar 163133.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Bartolomeo all’Isola
16 Jan 164547.3AppointedArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
12 Feb 164951.4DiedArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Agustín Spínola Basadone:
Agustín Cardinal Spínola Basadone (born , died ) Archbishop of Sevilla {Seville}

  • a priest for 27.1 years
  • a bishop for 25.7 years
  • a cardinal for 28.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 11 Jan 1621
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,391
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 15, and Page 174
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 204, and Page 158
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 196
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 144, Number 916
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1623, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 23 Feb 2015