Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfonso de Requeséns Fenollet, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Barbastro

Note/Previous Titular See: (Vic confirmation occured after his death)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1570¹BornCervera
30 Aug 161040.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Rosanensis
1621²51.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Toledo, Spain
11 Aug 162555.6SelectedBishop of Barbastro, Spain
6 Oct 162555.8ConfirmedBishop of Barbastro, Spain
18 Jan 163969.0SelectedBishop of Vic, Spain
8 Apr 163969.3DiedBishop of Barbastro, Spain
2 May 163969.3ConfirmedBishop of Vic, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain ; ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Alfonso de Requeséns Fenollet:
Bishop Alfonso de Requeséns Fenollet O.F.M. (died ) Bishop of Barbastro

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 109, and Page 367
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 297
  • bp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 18 Jan 2014