Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Olomouc

Archidioecesis Olomucensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Jan Graubner, Archbishop
  • Josef Hrdlička, Auxiliary Bishop

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 5 December 1777
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Czech Republic
  • Square Kilometers: 10,088 (3,896 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.ado.cz/
  • Mailing Address: Biskupske namesti 2, p. schr. 193, 771 01 Olomouc, Ceska Republika
  • Telephone: (068)550.04.01
  • Fax: 522.22.44

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Olomouc (Olmütz)
1063ErectedDiocese of Praha Diocese of Olomouc (Olmütz) (erected)
30 April 1344Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Olomouc (Olmütz) (from Mainz)
5 December 1777Territory LostDiocese of Olomouc (Olmütz) Diocese of Brno (erected)
Archdiocese of Olomouc
5 December 1777ElevatedDiocese of Olomouc (Olmütz) Archdiocese of Olomouc
30 May 1996Territory LostArchdiocese of Olomouc Diocese of Ostrava-Opava (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Olomouc
19491,504,1561,726,53887.1%1,0731291,2021,2513352,303701ap1951
197062962901,489650ap1971
19801,740,0002,165,00080.4%5481116592,6401111,825731ap1981
19901,761,6972,793,79863.1%3941565503,203156807731ap1991
1999750,0001,410,00053.2%2331183512,13627165361437ap2000
2000750,0001,410,00053.2%2301173472,16127155357437ap2001
2001750,0001,410,00053.2%2271213482,15527155423437ap2002
2002750,0001,410,00053.2%2371223592,08926161396437ap2003
2003750,0001,410,00053.2%2451213662,04926157385437ap2004
2004732,0001,376,00053.2%2461183642,01030155382437ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 4 Aug 2014