Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franciscus Antonius von und zu Losenstein

Deceased

Coadjutor Bishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic

Titular Bishop of Dura


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 May 1642³Born
27 Nov 169048.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic
27 Nov 169048.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Dura
11 Feb 169148.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dura
17 Jun 169250.0DiedCoadjutor Bishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Franciscus Antonius von und zu Losenstein
Bishop Franciscus Antonius von und zu Losenstein (born , died ) Coadjutor Bishop of Olomouc (Olmütz)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWien

  • a bishop for 1.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 190, and Page 296
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,691, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast