Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Johann Joseph von Breuner

Deceased

Archbishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jul 1641Born
1664¹22.4Ordained PriestPriest of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic
15 Dec 167029.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic
15 Dec 167029.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Nicopolis in Armenia
1 Mar 167129.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nicopolis in Armenia
23 Dec 169453.4SelectedArchbishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
4 Jul 169553.9ConfirmedArchbishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
6 Nov 169554.2InstalledArchbishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
20 Mar 171068.6DiedArchbishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Johann Joseph von Breuner
Archbishop Johann Joseph von Breuner (born , died ) Archbishop of Praha {Prague}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWien, Diocese of Wien, Austria
Ordained BishopS. Pierre, Brno

  • a priest for 46.2 years
  • a bishop for 39.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 288, and Page 323
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1671, Number 9
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 74, Number 5,891

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 23 Sep 2020

Quantcast