Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gottfried Kapaun von Swoykow

Deceased

Bishop of Hradec Králové


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Feb 1636³BornHradec Králové
21 Dec 165822.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
30 Mar 165923.1Ordained PriestPriest of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
23 Sep 169862.6SelectedBishop of Hradec Králové, Czech Republic
18 May 169963.2ConfirmedBishop of Hradec Králové, Czech Republic
28 Jun 169963.3Ordained BishopBishop of Hradec Králové, Czech Republic
18 Nov 170165.7DiedBishop of Hradec Králové, Czech Republic

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gottfried Kapaun von Swoykow:
Bishop Gottfried Kapaun von Swoykow (born , died ) Bishop of Hradec Králové

  • a priest for 42.6 years
  • a bishop for 2.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 332
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1699, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 3 May 2015