Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vitus Seipel, O. Praem. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}

Titular Bishop of Hierapolis in Isauria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Dec 1650³BornLandeck
11 Feb 167423.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of the Canons Regular of Premontre; Norbertines
5 Mar 167827.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of the Canons Regular of Premontre; Norbertines
3 Jan 170150.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
3 Jan 170150.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Hierapolis in Isauria
24 Feb 170150.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hierapolis in Isauria
9 Mar 171160.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Vitus Seipel:
Bishop Vitus Seipel O. Praem. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}

  • a priest for 33.0 years
  • a bishop for 10.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1701, Number 5
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 220

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 6 May 2015