Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Blažej Jáklin

Deceased

Bishop of Nitra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Sep 1644BornMurská Sobota, Slovenia
18 Sep 166622.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
31 Jul 166722.8Ordained PriestPriest
16 Jan 168843.3SelectedBishop of Knin (Tinin), Croatia
29 Nov 168844.2ConfirmedBishop of Knin (Tinin), Croatia
13 Mar 168944.5Ordained BishopBishop of Knin (Tinin), Croatia
26 Nov 169147.2AppointedBishop of Nitra, Slovakia
17 Oct 169551.1DiedBishop of Nitra, Slovakia

MicroData Summary for Blažej Jáklin
Bishop Blažej Jáklin (born , died ) Bishop of Nitra

  • a priest for 28.2 years
  • a bishop for 6.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 290, and Page 381
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1689, Number 5
  • c34: CB, 19 Jul 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 24 Jul 2016