Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Péter Korompay

Deceased

Bishop of Nitra, Slovakia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jun 1633Born
28 Apr 168147.8AppointedBishop of Vác, Hungary
21 Sep 168148.2Ordained BishopBishop of Vác, Hungary
20 Apr 168248.8AppointedBishop of Eger, Hungary
24 Nov 168754.4AppointedBishop of Nitra, Slovakia
12 May 169056.8DiedBishop of Nitra, Slovakia

MicroData Summary for Péter Korompay
Bishop Péter Korompay (born , died ) Bishop of Nitra

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNahács

  • a bishop for 8.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 73, and Page 290
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 402
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,681, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast