Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ján Gubasóczy (Gubašóci)

Deceased

Bishop of Nitra, Slovakia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1623¹Born
26 Sep 166845.7SelectedBishop of Pécs, Hungary
17 Nov 167047.8ConfirmedBishop of Pécs, Hungary
12 Dec 167653.9SelectedBishop of Vác, Hungary
12 Jul 167754.5ConfirmedBishop of Vác, Hungary
13 May 168057.3AppointedBishop of Nitra, Slovakia
1685¹62.0SelectedArchbishop of Kalocsa, Hungary
10 Apr 168663.2DiedBishop of Nitra, Slovakia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ján Gubasóczy (Gubašóci)
Bishop Ján Gubasóczy (Gubašóci) (born 1623, died ) Bishop of Nitra

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTrnava

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 164, and Page 290
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 326, and Page 402
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1671, Number 64

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018