Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ernst von Trautson zu Falkenstein

Deceased

Bishop of Wien


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Dec 1633BornWien
11 Jun 166127.5Ordained PriestPriest of Salzburg, Austria
23 Mar 168551.2SelectedBishop of Wien, Austria
10 Sep 168551.7ConfirmedBishop of Wien, Austria
28 Oct 168551.8Ordained BishopBishop of Wien, Austria
7 Jan 170268.0DiedBishop of Wien, Austria

MicroData Summary for Ernst von Trautson zu Falkenstein:
Bishop Ernst von Trautson zu Falkenstein (born , died ) Bishop of Wien

  • a priest for 40.6 years
  • a bishop for 16.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013