Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antal Ferenc von Pucheim

Deceased

Bishop of Wiener Neustadt


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jul 1664³BornWien
13 Jan 169530.5Ordained DeaconDeacon
16 Jan 169530.5Ordained PriestPriest
27 Jul 169531.0SelectedBishop of Wiener Neustadt, Austria
19 Sep 169531.2ConfirmedBishop of Wiener Neustadt, Austria
13 Oct 171854.2DiedBishop of Wiener Neustadt, Austria

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antal Ferenc von Pucheim:
Bishop Antal Ferenc von Pucheim (born , died ) Bishop of Wiener Neustadt

  • a priest for 23.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die BischŲfe der Deutschsprachigen Lšnder
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 285

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013