Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Otto János Teofil Tóth (von Volkra)

Deceased

Bishop of Veszprém


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Nov 1665³BornWien
28 May 171044.5SelectedBishop of Veszprém, Hungary
1 Oct 171044.9ConfirmedBishop of Veszprém, Hungary
30 Nov 171045.0Ordained BishopBishop of Veszprém, Hungary
19 Dec 172055.1DiedBishop of Veszprém, Hungary

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Otto János Teofil Tóth (von Volkra):
Bishop Otto János Teofil Tóth (von Volkra) (born , died ) Bishop of Veszprém

  • a bishop for 10.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 413
  • name/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1710, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 30 Jun 2015