Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Christian August Cardinal von Sachsen-Zeitz

Deceased

Archbishop of Esztergom

Bishop of Győr (Raab)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Oct 1666BornMoritzburg
18 Jun 169629.6AppointedBishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary
24 Jan 170134.2AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Esztergom, Hungary
17 May 170639.6Elevated to Cardinal
20 Jan 170740.2SucceededArchbishop of Esztergom, Hungary
23 Aug 172558.8DiedArchbishop of Esztergom, Hungary

MicroData Summary for Christian August von Sachsen-Zeitz:
Christian August Cardinal von Sachsen-Zeitz (born , died ) Archbishop of Esztergom

  • a cardinal for 19.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 17 May 1706
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1696, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 7 May 2015