Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Athanasie Anghel Popa

Deceased

Titular Bishop


Events

DateEventTitle
1698²AppointedBishop
17 Mar 1701Converted
24 Mar 1701Ordained PriestPriest
25 Mar 1701Ordained BishopTitular Bishop
19 Aug 1713DiedTitular Bishop

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Athanasie Anghel Popa:
Bishop Athanasie Anghel Popa (died ) Titular Bishop

  • a priest for 12.4 years
  • a bishop for 12.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 185, Number 15,117
  • b/ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Number 17,159
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Number 17,160
  • conv: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 209, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1698, Number 1
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1701, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 7 May 2015