Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Adam von Wratislaw von Mitrowitz

Deceased

Bishop of Litoměřice


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 May 1677BornChotoviny
15 Apr 170224.9Ordained PriestPriest of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
12 Nov 171033.5SelectedBishop of Hradec Králové, Czech Republic
12 May 171134.0ConfirmedBishop of Hradec Králové, Czech Republic
14 Jun 171134.1Ordained BishopBishop of Hradec Králové, Czech Republic
9 Jan 172143.6SelectedBishop of Litoměřice, Czech Republic
24 Sep 172144.3ConfirmedBishop of Litoměřice, Czech Republic
3 May 172245.0InstalledBishop of Litoměřice, Czech Republic
2 Jun 173356.0DiedBishop of Litoměřice, Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Johann Adam von Wratislaw von Mitrowitz:
Bishop Johann Adam von Wratislaw von Mitrowitz (born , died ) Bishop of Litoměřice

  • a priest for 31.1 years
  • a bishop for 22.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013