Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop László Ádám Erdődy

Deceased

Bishop of Nitra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Sep 1677BornPresbourg
17 Jun 170628.7SelectedBishop of Nitra, Slovakia
21 Feb 170729.3ConfirmedBishop of Nitra, Slovakia
10 May 173658.6DiedBishop of Nitra, Slovakia

MicroData Summary for László Ádám Erdődy:
Bishop László Ádám Erdődy (born , died ) Bishop of Nitra

Source(s):
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1707
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1707, Number 38
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 290

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.8, 27 Jul 2015; Data: 10 Aug 2015