Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ignaz von Lovina

Deceased

Bishop of Wiener Neustadt


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jul 1660BornSiders
27 May 168423.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Lausanne, Switzerland
23 Sep 168424.2Ordained PriestPriest of Lausanne, Switzerland
2 Nov 171858.3SelectedBishop of Wiener Neustadt, Austria
15 Mar 171958.6ConfirmedBishop of Wiener Neustadt, Austria
23 Apr 171958.7Ordained BishopBishop of Wiener Neustadt, Austria
14 Sep 172060.1DiedBishop of Wiener Neustadt, Austria

MicroData Summary for Ignaz von Lovina:
Bishop Ignaz von Lovina (born , died ) Bishop of Wiener Neustadt

  • a priest for 35.9 years
  • a bishop for 1.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • ob/c2+: CB, 24 Sep 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1719, Number 12
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 285

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015