Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Imre Esterházy, O.S.P.P.E. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Esztergom


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jul 1665BornVágújhely
15 Feb 168822.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Paul the First Hermit
23 Dec 170641.4SelectedBishop of Vác, Hungary
1 Aug 170742.0ConfirmedBishop of Vác, Hungary
4 Mar 170842.6Ordained BishopBishop of Vác, Hungary
9 Sep 170944.1AppointedBishop of Zagreb (Agram), Croatia
17 Jan 172357.4SelectedBishop of Veszprém, Hungary
31 Aug 172560.1SelectedArchbishop of Esztergom, Hungary
17 Mar 172761.6ConfirmedArchbishop of Esztergom, Hungary
6 Dec 174580.3DiedArchbishop of Esztergom, Hungary

MicroData Summary for Imre Esterházy:
Archbishop Imre Esterházy O.S.P.P.E. (born , died ) Archbishop of Esztergom

  • a priest for 57.8 years
  • a bishop for 37.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 364, and Page 402
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 413, and Page 421
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1708, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 7 Jul 2015