Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Márton Brajkovićs

Deceased

Bishop of Zagreb (Agram)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Nov 1668³BornSenj
10 Aug 169223.7Ordained PriestPriest
14 Jan 169829.1SelectedBishop of Senj (-Modruš), Croatia
30 Mar 169930.3ConfirmedBishop of Senj (-Modruš), Croatia
3 May 169930.4Ordained BishopBishop of Senj (-Modruš), Croatia
27 Apr 170334.4SelectedBishop of Zagreb (Agram), Croatia
14 Jan 170435.1ConfirmedBishop of Zagreb (Agram), Croatia
4 Jun 170839.5DiedBishop of Zagreb (Agram), Croatia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Márton Brajkovićs:
Bishop Márton Brajkovićs (born , died ) Bishop of Zagreb (Agram)

  • a priest for 15.8 years
  • a bishop for 9.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 350, and Page 421
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1699, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 23 Jun 2015