Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Georgius Patachich de Zajezda

Deceased

Bishop of Bosnia (Bosna)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Nov 1670³BornZagreb
29 Mar 170332.3SelectedBishop of Bosnia (Bosna), Croatia
12 Nov 170332.9ConfirmedBishop of Bosnia (Bosna), Croatia
30 Mar 170433.3Ordained BishopBishop of Bosnia (Bosna), Croatia
Jan 1716²45.1DiedBishop of Bosnia (Bosna), Croatia

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Georgius Patachich de Zajezda:
Bishop Georgius Patachich de Zajezda (born , died Jan 1716) Bishop of Bosnia (Bosna)

  • a bishop for 11.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 124
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1704, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 30 Jun 2015