Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stjepan Seliščević

Deceased

Bishop of Zagreb (Agram)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jul 1637³BornTuhel
11 Jun 166123.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
25 Jul 166124.0Ordained PriestPriest
10 Jan 169557.5AppointedBishop of Zagreb (Agram), Croatia
20 Mar 169557.7Ordained BishopBishop of Zagreb (Agram), Croatia
1 Apr 170365.7DiedBishop of Zagreb (Agram), Croatia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Stjepan Seliščević:
Bishop Stjepan Seliščević (born , died ) Bishop of Zagreb (Agram)

  • a priest for 41.6 years
  • a bishop for 8.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 421
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Number 17,575
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1695, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 3 May 2015