Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Benedictus Bedekovich

Deceased

Bishop of Senj (-Modruš), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Aug 1667³Born
14 Sep 169225.0Ordained PriestPriest
28 Jun 170335.8SelectedBishop of Senj (-Modruš), Croatia
10 Mar 170436.5ConfirmedBishop of Senj (-Modruš), Croatia
4 May 170436.7Ordained BishopBishop of Senj (-Modruš), Croatia
Dec 1708²41.2DiedBishop of Senj (-Modruš), Croatia

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Benedictus Bedekovich
Bishop Benedictus Bedekovich (born , died Dec 1708) Bishop of Senj (-Modruš)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZachretje

  • a priest for 16.2 years
  • a bishop for 4.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 350
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1704, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast